judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01042-CV
05-89-01042-CV
09/01/1989
Contract
Beigel, Henry, d/b/a Dallas City View and d/b/a Grande Lodge
Hedda Stimac
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order enteredDestroy
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/13/1997Record RetentionDestroy
08/28/1991Mandate Issued
08/28/1991Mandate Issued
06/28/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/28/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/26/1990Submission
06/26/1990Submitted
06/26/1990Submission
06/26/1990Submitted
05/07/1990MattConv
03/26/1990Case ready to be set
03/26/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/26/1990Case ready to be set
03/23/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
03/19/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
03/07/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/02/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
02/02/1990Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/1990Response to Motion
01/19/1990Brief Filed
01/19/1990Mot Ext Time File Strans
01/19/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/19/1990Supplemental Transcript filed
01/10/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/08/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/05/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/10/1989Brief Filed
11/06/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/02/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/02/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/22/1989MattConv
09/07/1989Exhibits Filed
09/05/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/01/1989Transcript Filed
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/02/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/05/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Glen R. Snyder
cc86-17202-b