judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-9021
C-9021
09/01/1989
App Writ Err (2) Originally filed as 130(d)
TOWN OF SUNNYVALE TEXAS ET AL.
CHARLES MAYHEW SR. ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/05/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/11/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)ON BEHALF OF THE TX. ASSN. OF BUILDERS/BY SARAH C. SWANSON, 510 W. 15TH ST., AUSTIN,TX. 78701 512/476-6346
03/23/1990Reply to ResponseRespondentBEHALF OF MAYHEWSequence #: 02
03/09/1990Reply to ResponseRespondentBEHALF OF TOWN OF SUNNYVALE, TX, ELOISE PATRICK, ROBERT SANDERS, GORDON DAVIS, AND CARROLL BROWNSequence #: 01
03/08/1990Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
03/08/1990Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#1 TOWN OF SUNNYVALESequence #: 01
03/08/1990Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#2 CHARLES MAYHEW SR. ET AL.Sequence #: 02
02/22/1990Letter brief RespondentMAYHEW'S REPLY TO SUNNYVALE'S LETTER BRIEF
12/27/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)THOMAS H. KEEN; LUPSHIRE COMPANY, 1445 ROSS AVE, SUITE #3200, DALLAS, TX 75202 (214) 855-4500
11/03/1989Reply BriefPetitionerRESPONSE TO MAYHEW'S REPLY MEMO- RANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/05/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/12/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNo rehearing filed
09/12/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
09/12/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#2 - CHARLES MAYHEWSequence #: 2
09/12/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#1-TOWN OF SUNNYVALESequence #: 1
05/11/1990Amicus Curiae Brief receivedON BEHALF OF THE TX. ASSN. OF BUILDERS/BY SARAH C. SWANSON, 510 W. 15TH ST., AUSTIN,TX. 78701 512/476-6346
03/29/1990Case forwarded to Court
03/29/1990No description available.
03/23/1990Motion for Extension of Length of Brief filed
03/23/1990Petitioner's reply briefSequence #: 02
03/23/1990Reply to ResponseBEHALF OF MAYHEWSequence #: 02
03/09/1990Motion for Extension of Length of Brief filedBEHALF OF TOWN OF SUNNYVALE, TX,
03/09/1990Reply to ResponseBEHALF OF TOWN OF SUNNYVALE, TX, ELOISE PATRICK, ROBERT SANDERS, GORDON DAVIS, AND CARROLL BROWNSequence #: 01
03/08/1990Application for Writ of Error - FiledCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
03/08/1990Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#2 CHARLES MAYHEW SR. ET AL.Sequence #: 02
03/08/1990Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#1 TOWN OF SUNNYVALESequence #: 01
02/22/1990Letter brief MAYHEW'S REPLY TO SUNNYVALE'S LETTER BRIEF
02/07/1990Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.OverruledRESP (MAYHEW) MO/DISQUALIFY (MAYHEW ET AL. APPLICATION IS NOW DUE IN 15 DA (2/22/90).
02/07/1990Motion to Stay DisposedOverruledRESP (MAYHEW) EMERGENCY MO/STAY PRO- CEEDINGS OVERRULED
02/07/1990Motion to strike disposedOverruledPET (TOWN ET AL) MO.TO STRIKE IN PT. THE AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES L. NORTHRUP IS OVERRULED.
01/26/1990Letter Filed
12/27/1989Amicus Curiae Brief receivedTHOMAS H. KEEN; LUPSHIRE COMPANY, 1445 ROSS AVE, SUITE #3200, DALLAS, TX 75202 (214) 855-4500
11/03/1989Reply BriefRESPONSE TO MAYHEW'S REPLY MEMO- RANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
10/27/1989Reply to Response to MotionREPLY TO MO TO STRIKE
10/19/1989Motion to Strike filedIN PART, THE AFFIDAVIT OF NORTHRUP
10/19/1989Letter FiledCHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR TERRENCE S. WELCH
10/19/1989Reply to Response to MotionRESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFYSequence #: 01
10/12/1989Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See RemarksRE EVT.11 AND ATTYS CALLED. - PHL GRANTING OF 2D 130(D) EXTENDED TO 15 DAYS AFTER RULING ON MO/DISQUALIFY.
10/12/1989Request made for reply to proceedingFR/TOWN OF SUNNY.TO MO/DISQUALIFY WITHIN 7 DA. 2D M/E/T F/MAYHEW GRANTED TO 15 DAYS AFTER CT RULES ON MO/DIS.
10/11/1989Motion for Extension of Length of Brief filedON BEHALF OF TOWN OF SUNNYVALE, TX
10/06/1989Miscellaneous MotionMOTION TO DISQUALIFY
10/06/1989Motion to Stay Filed MAYHEW'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS
10/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
10/06/1989Second M/E/T to file App Writ Err disposed of.Filing grantedMAYHEW'S APP DUE 16 OCTOBER 1989
10/06/1989Second M/E/T to file App Writ Err Filed.CHARLES MAYHEW'S 2ND 130(D) MOTIONSequence #: 02
09/08/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedON BEHALF OF CHARLES MAYHEW, SR.
09/06/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filedSequence #: 02
09/06/1989Letter FiledRE: PET HAS NO OBJECTION TO MAYHEW'S 130(D)Sequence #: 01
09/05/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedBEHALF/TOWN OF SUNNYVALE, TX.
09/01/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filedSequence #: 01
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/12/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE ESTATE OF AUDREY MAYHEWPetitionerMr. Terrence S. Welch
ELOISE PATRICKPetitionerMr. N. Alex Bickley
CHARLES MAYHEW, JR.PetitionerMr. Terrence S. Welch
GORDON DAVISPetitionerMr. N. Alex Bickley
SUNNYVALE PROPERTIES, LTDPetitionerMr. Terrence S. Welch
CARROLL BROWNPetitionerMr. N. Alex Bickley
ROBERT SANDERSPetitionerMr. N. Alex Bickley
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00734-CV
In Part aff/Rev/Rem
774 SW2d 284
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Warren Whitham
Trial Court Information
192nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill Hartman
87-3074-K