judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00216-CV
02-89-00216-CV
09/01/1989
Contract
Landers, Kenneth E.
Adelson, Eugene V. and Gerson B. Berstein
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/1990Mandate Issued
05/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/24/1990Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/1990Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
03/06/1990Submitted
03/06/1990Submission
12/26/1989Brief Filed
11/29/1989Brief Filed
10/26/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/28/1989Submission
09/22/1989Submission
09/15/1989No Description Available.
09/15/1989No Description Available.
09/01/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
17th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Fred W. Davis
17-116733-88