judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00215-CV
02-89-00215-CV
09/01/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Tandy Computer Leasing, A Division of Tandy Electronics, Inc
Meyer, Michael A., d/b/a Michael A. Meyer, D. O.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/11/1990Mandate Issued
05/22/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
05/22/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
05/02/1990Letter
03/14/1990Submitted
03/14/1990Submission
03/08/1990Order Entered
12/22/1989Brief Filed
12/11/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/20/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/13/1989Brief Filed
11/06/1989Motion Filed
10/12/1989No Description Available.
10/12/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/11/1989No Description Available.
10/03/1989Submission
10/03/1989No Description Available.
09/01/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/11/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Tarrant
88-26555-2