judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-9025
C-9025
09/05/1989
App Writ of Error
FRITZ CHEMICAL COMPANY
PORT DISTRIBUTING CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/05/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/01/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
01/31/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDismissedAS SUPPLEMENTED.
01/31/1990m/l/f to file supplemental application disposedFiling granted
01/31/1990Motion to dismiss disposedFiling grantedW/M/L TO SUPP APP IS GRANTED. APP IS DISMISSED AS SUPPLEMENTED, PURSUANT TO RULE 59(A)(1)(A), T.R.A.P.
01/22/1990Motion to dismiss application for writ of errorJT/MO TO DISMISS APPEAL
01/18/1990Notice requesting filing fee
09/26/1989Motion for Leave to file Supplement to Application
09/26/1989Supplement or amendment to application.
09/07/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/07/1989No description available.
09/07/1989Reply to Response
09/05/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/01/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01041-CV
Reversed & Remanded
775 SW2d 669, 07-25-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable PAT MCCLUNG
Trial Court Information
298th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Adolph Canales
87-16455-M