judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00885-CV
01-89-00885-CV
08/31/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Turtur, Mario
Alexander, Tom
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/07/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/07/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/21/1991No petition for review or writ of error was filed
03/21/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/08/1991Motion for rehearing filed
02/21/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/21/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/15/1990Submitted
05/15/1990Submission
05/15/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
03/01/1990Amended brief filed.
02/26/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/26/1990Case ready to be set
02/26/1990Case ready to be set
02/15/1990Motion strans disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
02/02/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
02/01/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/26/1990Motion for leave to file strans
12/21/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/19/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
12/08/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/17/1989Statement of facts filed
11/02/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/20/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/02/1989Filing fee paid
09/22/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/13/1989Filing fee paid
08/31/1989Transcript filed
08/31/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/18/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/07/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantLynne Liberato
StateAppelleeTom Alexander
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 1
Harris
523792