judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1227-89
PD-1227-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
GUILDER, DONALD FRANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GUILDER, DONALD FRANKApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John H. Hagler
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00632-CR
Abated 6-19-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
291st District Court
Dallas
Honorable HARRY HOPKINS
F88-77168-IU