judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1228-89
PD-1228-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
HARGE, REGINALD LYNN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HARGE, REGINALD LYNNApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John H. Hagler
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00906-CR
Aff 6-5-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable RON CHAPMAN
F87-84337-PH