judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00217-CV
02-89-00217-CV
09/01/1989
Contract
Landers, Kenneth E.
Texas American Bank/Fort Worth, N. A.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/29/1990Mandate Issued
05/30/1990Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyMotion or Writ Granted
05/15/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/04/1990Response Filed
05/01/1990Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
04/27/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/11/1990Motion for Extension for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/1990Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed
03/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/06/1990Submitted
03/06/1990Submission
11/17/1989Brief Filed
10/23/1989Brief Filed
09/21/1989Submission
09/21/1989Exhibits Filed
09/21/1989No Description Available.
09/21/1989No Description Available.
09/01/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
48th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable John K. Narsutis
48-113675-88