judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE v. CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., d/b/a WYOMING TRIBUNE EAGLE, and D. REED ECKHARDT

Case Heading (S-10-0221)
Case Number:S-10-0221Case Docketed On:10/13/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE v. CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., d/b/a WYOMING TRIBUNE EAGLE, and D. REED ECKHARDT
Full Title:LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, Appellant (Defendant), v. CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., d/b/a WYOMING TRIBUNE EAGLE, and D. REED ECKHARDT, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLaramie County School District No. 1David F. Evans
Richard D. Bush
Kristi Marie Radosevich
AppelleeCheyenne Newspapers, Inc., a Wyoming corporationMichael J. Krampner
Ian Keith Sandefer
AppelleeD. Reed EckhardtMichael J. Krampner
Ian Keith Sandefer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Public Records
Opinion Number:2011 WY 55
Citation:250 P.3d 522

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/13/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/13/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/30/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's opening brief; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Ian Keith Sandefer for AppelleesNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
01/10/2011Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
01/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc d/b/a Wyoming Tribune Eagle, and Reed Eckhardt, Entry of Appearance and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/21/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ian K. Sandefer for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Richard D. Bush for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/03/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/17/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David F. Evans and Richard D. Bush, argument by Mr. Bush for appellant; Ian K. Sandefer for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/29/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/05/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
04/11/2011Event - Phone Call - Called Counsel for Appellees to request hard copies of motion for fees and costs that hasn't been received.EventPhone CallFinal
04/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Motion for Costs and Fees Pursuant to W.R.A.P. 10.05EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/25/2011Response/Objection - CostsResponse/ObjectionCostsFinal
04/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Laramie County School District No. One's response in opposition to appellees' motion for costs and fees pursuant to WRAP 10.05.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/03/2011Order - Denying appellees' motion for costs and feesOrderDenyFinal
05/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/03/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/03/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/06/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/5/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal