judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAINSBERGER VS. NEVADA BOARD OF PAROLE COMM'RS

Case Information: 31456
Short Caption:RAINSBERGER VS. NEVADA BOARD OF PAROLE COMM'RSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9600798HClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/22/1999How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/01/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/01/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
12/03/1997Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.
02/26/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant.
05/27/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice to the Court.
06/02/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time in Which to file Appellant's Docketing Statement and for a new Briefing Schedule.
06/02/1998Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
07/07/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's 6/2/98 motion in part. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement provisionally submitted on June 2, 1998. However, we suspend briefing in the current matter until further order of this court and resolution of the jurisdictional issue addressed by attorney Logan. In order to aid our resolution of the matter, the clerk of the district court shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, transmit a certified copy of the certificate of service by mail which was filed on June 30, 1997. fn1[The notice of appeal packet previously transmitted to this court already contains the order and notice of order which were filed on June 30, 1997, in the district court.
07/07/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
07/09/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified copy of Certificate of Service by mail filed in District Court on June 30, 1997.
08/11/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 7, 1998, this court entered an order suspending the briefing schedule in this appeal pending resolution of a jurisdictional question addressed in appellant's docketing statement. We conclude that this court has jurisdiction to consider this appeal. We reinstate the briefing schedule. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief on appeal and the appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a).
09/10/1998MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 12, 1998.
10/12/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion to Extend Time in which to file Appellant's Opening Brief.
10/19/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed October 12, 1998, is granted. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before November 12, 1998.
11/12/1998BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: hand delivered 11/12/98.
11/12/1998AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief.
12/09/1998BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 12/9/98.
10/22/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-06285
05/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06412
05/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2001. 01-06412