judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1224-89
PD-1224-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
WILLIAMSON, DARRYL JEROME
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Williamson, Darryl JeromeApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Blake Withrow
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00523-CR
Rev & Rem 5-5-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 2 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable LARRY W. BARAKA
F88-77725-NI