judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00422-CV
04-89-00422-CV
09/01/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Hernan A. Salazar, D.O.
Linda S. Duncan
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/24/1990Original Exhibits Returned
05/24/1990Mandate Issued
05/24/1990Mandate Issued
03/30/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/30/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/14/1990Submitted
02/14/1990Submission
02/14/1990Submitted
01/05/1990Submission
11/14/1989Requests Oral Argument
11/14/1989Case ready to be set
11/14/1989Brief Filed
11/14/1989Case ready to be set
10/27/1989Brief Filed
10/27/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/27/1989Exhibits Filed
09/27/1989No Description Available.
09/01/1989No Description Available.
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/20/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/30/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/24/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
37th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carolyn Spears Petersen
87-CI-14170
n/a