judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00826-CR
14-89-00826-CR
09/05/1989
All Misdemeanors
Storrie, John H.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1990Case stored
09/19/1990Mandate Issued
09/19/1990Mandate Issued
09/04/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
08/17/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
08/02/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/02/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/01/1990Submitted
08/01/1990Submission
08/01/1990Submitted
12/08/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/08/1989Case ready to be set
12/08/1989Case ready to be set
11/15/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/18/1989No description available.
10/16/1989Transcript FILED
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/23/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
08/18/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/11/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantAtwood R. McAndrew III
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn Brook
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 8
Harris
Honorable NELL A. RICHARDSON
891,5906
$101. fine