judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1221-89
PD-1221-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
GARZA, ROBERT RAY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
12/04/1989NOTICE RETURNED
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
GARZA, ROBERT RAYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Douglas W. Skemp
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01219-CR
Aff 7-25-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
291st District Court
Dallas
Honorable GERRY MEIER
F88-80681-TU