judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1220-89
PD-1220-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
SMITH, RANDY KIM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/17/1989SUPP BR MOT TOGranted
10/17/1989SUPP BR MOT TOFiled
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
SMITH, RANDY KIMApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Braden W. Sparks
Court of Appeals Information:
05-87-01289-CR
Aff 5-26-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No 9
Dallas
Honorable George B. Shepherd, Jr.
MB87-44867-K