judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1217-89
PD-1217-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
VILLANUEVA, MARY JANE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
VILLANUEVA, MARY JANEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Renato Santos, Jr.
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00991-CR
Rev & Rem 7-27-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable BOB BURDETTE
508203