judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1223-89
PD-1223-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
MITCHELL, NATHAN ROBERT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mitchell, Nathan RobertApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Royce West
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00410-CR
Aff 7-25-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
283rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable JACK HAMPTON
F87-96523-UT