judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1222-89
PD-1222-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
GLENNIE, JOHN WILLIAM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/17/1990FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
01/17/1990REHEAR DISPDENIED
12/08/1989REHEAR FILED
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/19/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GLENNIE, JOHN WILLIAMApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)William R. Holman
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Roach
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00833-CR
Aff 7-25-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3
Collin
Honorable John O''Keefe Barry
3-1497-87