judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-9028
C-9028
09/05/1989
WRIT ERROR - CAUSE
INA OF TEXAS
BILLY EUGENE BRISCOE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/28/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filed
12/13/1989Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filed
09/19/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/05/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/28/1990Cost letter issuedF/$75 FEE ON GRANTING APP. (BRISCOE)
01/30/1990Mandate issuedREHEARING OVERRULED
01/10/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled780 SW2D 786
12/28/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
12/21/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
12/13/1989Motion for Rehearing
12/01/1989Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See RemarksTO ATTYS SENDING CORRECTED OPINION
11/29/1989Application for Writ of Error - Disposedsee former trap 133W/PER CURIAM OPINION
11/29/1989cover ltr with jmt
11/29/1989Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; remanded to Court of AppealsPER CURIAM 780 SW2D 786
11/29/1989Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
09/21/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/21/1989No description available.
09/19/1989Reply to Response
09/05/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/30/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
09-88-00180-CV
Reversed & Remanded
Rule 90, 06-22-89
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Honorable Lynn Jay Coker
10,390