judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1213-89
PD-1213-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
PERRY, EDDIE BOYD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/02/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/02/1989RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateWilliam R. Turner
PERRY, EDDIE BOYDApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Jim W. James
Court of Appeals Information:
10-88-00242-CR
Vacated & Remand 6-22-89
10th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
Honorable W. T. McDonald, Jr.
17,956-85