judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00827-CR
14-89-00827-CR
09/05/1989
Other Drug Possession
Henry, Frank M.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1990Case stored
06/05/1990Mandate Issued
06/05/1990Mandate Issued
05/21/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
05/04/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
04/19/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/19/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/04/1990Submitted
04/04/1990Submission
04/04/1990Submitted
03/08/1990Submission
12/21/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/21/1989Case ready to be set
12/21/1989Case ready to be set
12/06/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/16/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/16/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/02/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/02/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
11/01/1989No description available.
10/30/1989Transcript FILED
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/31/1989Date of Sentence
08/31/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasTimothy G. Taft
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJanet Seymour Morrow
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
Honorable M. A. LOVE
536,161
25 years TDC