judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1229-89
PD-1229-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
NELSON, RAYMOND NAYLOR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/29/1989OPINION ISSDRefused
11/29/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
NELSON, RAYMOND NAYLORApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John H. Hagler
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00696-CR
Aff 7-21-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
204th District Court
Dallas
Honorable RICHARD MAYS
F88-92922-KQ