judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00894-CV
01-89-00894-CV
09/01/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Schmitt, Jr., Arthur F.
Service Lloyds Insurance Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/14/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/14/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/21/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
12/06/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/11/1990Submitted
10/11/1990Submission
10/11/1990Submitted
09/22/1990Submission
04/12/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
04/12/1990Case ready to be set
04/12/1990Case ready to be set
03/22/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
02/21/1990Statement of facts filed
01/16/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
01/11/1990Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
12/27/1989Filing fee paid
12/27/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/19/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/05/1989Filing fee paid
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/11/1989Filing fee paid
09/01/1989Transcript filed
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/28/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/14/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellee
StateAppellantEd Wheeler
StateAppelleeTerry M. Womac
StateAppelleeTodd M. Lonergan
Trial Court Information
25th District Court
Colorado
16,495