judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TOWNSEND (DANELL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33467
Short Caption:TOWNSEND (DANELL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37876
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152174Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00363
01/07/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to this court. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. AttorneyJames L. Buchanan shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-00087
01/14/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Filing Order Granting Motion to Withdraw (filed in the district court on 01/07/99 - mailed on 01/11/99). 99-00272
01/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 12/18/98. (Not certified) 99-00382
01/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Buchanan is hereby again ordered to comply with NRAP 3C. Transcript request form or a cerrificate stating that no transcript is required due: 10 days. Fast track statement due: 30 days. 99-00590
02/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as counsel for appellant from attorney James L. Buchanan. 99-00869
03/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On February 8, 1999, Buchanan filed a motion to withdraw in this court. Buchanan may not withdraw because he has not fulfilled the obligations placed on trial counsel by NRAP 3C(b). The motion is therefore denied. Due 10 days from the date of this order: transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript required. Due 20 days from this order: fast track statement and appendix. 99-01353
03/22/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-02043
03/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy. 99-02167
03/29/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time in which File the Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-02279
04/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Due: 15 days from the date of this order. 99-02570
04/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion for Dismissal of Appeal for Failure to Comply with NRS 177.025. 99-02700
04/12/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-02735
04/12/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Appellant's Appendix). 99-02737
04/13/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 10/12/98 and 10/13/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 99-02807
04/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk is directed to strike the fast track statement filed on March 22, 1999, and the appendix filed on April 12, 1999. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to serve and file an amended fast track statement and a joint appendix or an appellant's appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from filing of the amended fast track statement and appendix to serve and file the fast track response. fn1[Respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal is denied]. 99-03362
05/07/1999MotionFiled Motion. Attorney, James L. Buchanan II's Renewed Motion to Withdraw. 99-03670
06/01/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-04500
06/18/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-05326
08/12/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[On May 7, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as counsel. We deny the motion as moot]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-07445
09/08/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-08468
09/08/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/23/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 13, 1999. 99-08468