Case Heading (S-08-0165) | |||||
Case Number: | S-08-0165 | Case Docketed On: | 08/01/2008 | ||
Linked To: | S-08-0163 , S-08-0164 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26) | ||
Short Title: | W. N. McMURRY CONSTRUCTION CO., a Wyoming corporation v. BW INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., and OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation | ||||
Full Title: | W. N. McMURRY CONSTRUCTION CO., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BW INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., and OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | W.N. McMurry Construction Co. | Weston W. Reeves Anna M. Reeves Olson |
Appellee | BW Insurance Agency, Inc. | Richard Alan Mincer Billie LM Addleman |
Appellee | Ohio Casualty Insurance Company | Patrick J. Murphy |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Contracts, Insurance Law |
Opinion Number: | 2010 WY 57 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/01/2008 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/01/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/01/2008 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
08/01/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
09/16/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received for brief that was rejected. Called for direction on what to do with briefs--told to discard them. The pages containing Social Security Nos. and Driver's License Nos. were pulled and shredded | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/16/2008 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
09/17/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant and designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/17/2008 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
10/17/2008 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
10/17/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee BW Insurance Agency, Inc. and received a copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/20/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee Ohio Casualty and copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/22/2008 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
10/23/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief to appellee BW | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/31/2008 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
11/03/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee Ohio Casualty | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/14/2008 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
11/18/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/19/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for Ohio Casualty. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
11/20/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - W.W. Reeves for W.N. McMurry Construction Co. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
11/25/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Richard Mincer for appellee BW Insurance. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/01/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
12/01/2008 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volumes I-V, original papers; Volume VI, deposition. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/01/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
12/17/2008 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick Murphy, Scott Klosterman for appellant, argument by Mr. Murphy; Weston W. Reeves, Anna Reeves Olson for cross appellant, argument by Mr. Reeves; Richard Mincer for appellee and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
12/17/2008 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
05/04/2010 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversing S-08-0163, dismissing S-08-0164 and affirming S-08-0165. Justice Golden writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
05/20/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
05/20/2010 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
05/20/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
05/20/2010 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
05/24/2010 | Service - Certified mail signature return cards (Record signed for 5/21/10) | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |