judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

D.C. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CV-1325
Short Caption:D.C. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAP9413-09Filed Date:10/21/2010

Opening Event Date:10/21/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/07/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantD.C. Department of CorrectionsN
Todd S. KimNY
Frank Mcdougald NN
Mary L. WilsonNY
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Office of Employee AppealsN
Sheila G. BarfieldNY
AppelleeMichael Dubose N
James E. McCollumNY
Amit K. Sharma NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 21, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
11/19/2010RECORD INDEX
11/19/2010RECORD COPIES
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (agency record vol 1-6)
11/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/22/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
12/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (opp) (elp)
12/14/2010APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to motion to voluntary dismissal (Dubose)
12/17/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion to dismiss this appeal, and appellee Michael Duboses's response thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b). (ETW) elp
12/17/2010DISMISSED
01/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED