judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5687
B-5687
12/10/1975
Application for Writ of Error
A. DONALD DAVIES, BISHOP, EPISCOPAL DIOCESE OF NORTH TEXAS
MILTON MEYER, COUNTY JUDGE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/14/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/04/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/31/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/18/1976Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/09/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/23/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
12/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/14/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/29/1976Opinion issued
05/04/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/31/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/18/1976Supplemental Brief filed
02/25/1976Document received (See Remarks)
01/09/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/26/1975Motion for production of documents filed
12/23/1975Response to Petition
12/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/10/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Baptist General Convention of TexasAmicus Curiae
Milton Meyer, County Judge, et al.Respondent
Texas Conference of ChurchesAmicus Curiae
A. Donald Davies, Bishop, Episcopal Diocese of North TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information