judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5683
B-5683
12/08/1975
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLA JEAN THOMAS
JAY BRADFORD REA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/08/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/22/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/23/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/08/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/23/1976Response to Motion filed
01/22/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/23/1975Response to Petition
12/08/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jay Bradford ReaRespondent
Charla Jean ThomasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information