judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: WR-5,025-02
WR-5,025-02
11/24/1975
1107-HC
MOLO, ORIN LEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/19/1998MOT FOR RECON DISPDeny Motion for Reconsideration--TRAP 79.2(d)
08/19/1998MOT FOR RECON DISPDeny Motion for Reconsideration--TRAP 79.2(d)
07/30/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
07/30/1998MOTION SUBMITTED
07/06/1998MOT FOR RECON RECD
07/06/1998MOT FOR RECON RECD
12/03/1975ACTION TAKENHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
12/03/1975ACTION TAKENHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
11/24/1975HC WRIT RECEIVED
11/24/1975Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
11/24/1975WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/19/1998STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Molo, Orin LeeApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information