judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6217
B-6217
08/09/1976
Application for Writ of Error
GGE MANAGEMENT CO., J. B. WESTMORELAND, RICHARD B. MERRILL, JR., GILBERT GERTNER AND GGE MANAGEMENT CO., GILBERT GERTNER, GGE MANAGEMENT CO. AND J. B. WESTMORELAND, GILBERT GERTNER
COMMERCE SAVINGS ASSOCIATION OF BRAZORIA COUNTY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/12/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/06/1977Notice of Appeal filedPetitioner
12/20/1976Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/20/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/09/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/09/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/08/1976Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/03/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/08/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/04/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/24/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
08/23/1976Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/11/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
08/11/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/11/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/11/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/11/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/14/1977Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
01/12/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/06/1977Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
01/06/1977Notice of Appeal filed
12/23/1976Letter Filed
12/20/1976Brief in Support of Petition
12/20/1976Response to Motion filed
12/20/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/13/1976Response to Motion filed
12/09/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/09/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/09/1976Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
12/08/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/03/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/24/1976Opinion issued
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1976Document received (See Remarks)
11/08/1976Reply to Response
10/04/1976Reply to Response
09/24/1976Response to Petition
08/23/1976Response to Petition
08/19/1976Document received (See Remarks)
08/19/1976Document received (See Remarks)
08/11/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/11/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/11/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/11/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/11/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/11/1976Document received (See Remarks)
08/09/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gilbert Gertner, GGE Management Co. and J. B. WestmorelandPetitioner
GGE Management Co.Petitioner
Gilbert Gertner and GGE Management Co.Petitioner
Commerce Savings Association of Brazoria CountyRespondent
J. B. WestmorelandPetitioner
Richard B. Merrill, Jr.Petitioner
Gilbert GertnerPetitioner
Don AronAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information