judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES C. TUCKER v. WYO CENTRAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Case Heading (S-08-0175)
Case Number:S-08-0175Case Docketed On:08/13/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:JAMES C. TUCKER v. WYO CENTRAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Full Title:JAMES C. TUCKER, Appellant (Defendant), v. WYO CENTRAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames C. TuckerStephen R. Winship
AppelleeWyo Central Federal Credit UnionThomas M. Hogan

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/13/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/13/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/20/2008Event - Phone Call. Received phone call from Mr. Hogan regarding caption. Appellee is Wyo Central Federal Credit Union (not Wyoming). Caption and participant screens were changed in system.EventPhone CallFinal
08/21/2008Correspondence - Outgoing - letter to Mr. Winship regarding change of caption.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
09/15/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntary (stipulated).MotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
09/16/2008Event - Hardcopy received joint motion to dismissEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/16/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
09/16/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal