judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN MALONE V. GLORIA SISTRUNK

Case Information: 10-FM-1371
Short Caption:KEVIN MALONE V. GLORIA SISTRUNKClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO3231-10Filed Date:10/29/2010

Opening Event Date:10/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/14/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin Malone NPro SeN
AppelleeGloria Sistrunk NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/29/2010 ORDERED that appellant's request for appointment of counsel is denied. It is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (ETW)
12/06/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 9/27/10 (rt. needed)
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (57 pgs/tape) 9/27/10 proc.
06/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/06/2011RECORD INDEX
06/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
07/07/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF no appendix
07/07/2011APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/documents attached
07/25/2011FiledORDER Denying -APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
08/30/2011FiledOrder directing appendix
09/22/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
09/22/2011FiledDismissed
10/14/2011FiledMandate