judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6208
B-6208
08/09/1976
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT D. HEJL
ELLA WIRTH MEREDITH, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/08/1976Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
10/28/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/14/1976Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
08/20/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
08/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/08/1976Supplemental Brief filed
11/01/1976Response to Motion filed
10/28/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/14/1976Supplemental Brief filed
09/13/1976Motion to amend application for writ of errorFiling granted
08/20/1976Response to Petition
08/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/09/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ella Wirth Meredith, et al.Respondent
Robert D. HejlPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information