judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00364-CR
04-89-00364-CR
07/26/1989
Marijuana Possession
Campbell, Alejandro Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/1990Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
04/19/1990Mandate Issued
04/19/1990Mandate Issued
02/28/1990Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
02/28/1990Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
02/21/1990Submitted
02/21/1990Submission
02/21/1990Submitted
01/05/1990Submission
12/18/1989Case ready to be set
12/18/1989Brief Filed
12/18/1989Case ready to be set
12/15/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/16/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedDismissed
11/16/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/15/1989Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
11/15/1989Brief Filed
11/02/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/09/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Denied
10/05/1989No Description Available.
10/05/1989Postcard Notice No Statement Of Facts Filed
09/05/1989No Description Available.
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/14/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/07/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/19/1990Case StoredCase stored
04/19/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
63rd Judicial District Court
Val Verde
Honorable George Thurmond
6280
3 years TDC