judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-89-00187-CR
10-89-00187-CR
07/26/1989
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Thomas Ray Pilgrim
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/29/2016Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
07/27/2016Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/02/1991Case stored
04/02/1991Mandate issued by this Court
02/14/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1991No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/17/1990No Description Available.
10/25/1990Submitted
10/25/1990Submission
06/28/1990No Description Available.
06/28/1990No Description Available.
06/28/1990Case ready to be set
06/21/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/18/1990No Description Available.
04/19/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/17/1990No Description Available.
02/22/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/22/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/20/1990No Description Available.
02/20/1990No Description Available.
01/22/1990No Description Available.
12/21/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/21/1989No Description Available.
09/28/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989No Description Available.
08/28/1989No Description Available.
08/28/1989No Description Available.
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/24/1989No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/2016Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasJohn W. Segrest
Pilgrim, Thomas RayAppellantKenneth Crow
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
Honorable George Allen
89-39-C
8 Years