judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: AP-70,891
AP-70,891
07/26/1989
Appeal Case Type
MADDOX, EX PARTE JOHN CROXTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/18/1989BRIEF FILEDState
11/03/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/06/1990MANDATE ISSD
03/21/1990OPINION ISSDHC Dismissed
12/18/1989BRIEF FILED
12/18/1989DISMISS MOTION TODENIED
12/18/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
12/11/1989DISMISS MOTION TOFiled
12/11/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
11/03/1989BRIEF FILED
10/11/1989ORDER FILED
10/04/1989SUBMITTED
07/26/1989WRIT FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/06/1990STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MADDOX, EX PARTE JOHN CROXTONApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Bill Wischkaemper
STATE OF TEXASStateGary A. Goff
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
286th District Court
Hockley
Honorable JAMES K. WALKER
2675-B