judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00289-CR
13-89-00289-CR
07/26/1989
Other Felony
Moreno, Arturo
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/09/1990Mandate Issued
04/24/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
04/09/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
03/22/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/13/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
12/21/1989Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
12/14/1989Submitted
12/14/1989Submission
12/13/1989Brief Filed
12/13/1989Motion for leave to file brief
12/13/1989State's (Crim) Brief Received
12/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/07/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/28/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/21/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
11/17/1989Submission
10/31/1989Brief Filed
10/31/1989Case ready to be set
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/18/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/13/1989Green card in
10/12/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/11/198910 day letter sent
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Motion for leave to file NOA DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/23/1989Sworn Statement filed
08/21/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/15/1989Affidavit Filed
08/14/1989Due date for record to be filed
08/01/1989Motion for leave to file notice of appeal
07/31/1989Green card in
07/26/1989Transcript Received
07/26/198910 day letter sent
07/26/1989Notice of appeal received
07/26/1989Transcript Filed
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/09/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
105th District Court
Kleberg
Honorable J. Manuel Banales
89-CRF-108
5 yrs tdc/prob 10