judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00698-CV
14-89-00698-CV
07/26/1989
Contract
Mower, Jr., Lowell Kendall
Boyer, Jack
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/19/1991Opinion issuedREVERSED AND RENDERED
12/19/1990Writ of Error DISPOSEDGRANTED
10/25/1990Writ of Error FILED
10/15/1990Writ of Error FILED
09/13/1990Motion to publish opinion DISPOSEDGRANTED
09/13/1990Mtn.for en banc consideration DISPOSED-APE,ANTDENIED
09/13/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
08/28/1990Motion to publish opinion FILED
08/23/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
08/09/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/09/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/25/1990Mtn.Lv. oral argument DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STAGRANTED
04/25/1990Submitted
04/25/1990Submission
04/25/1990Submitted
04/24/1990Mtn.Lv. oral argument FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
03/28/1990Submission
02/08/1990Mtn.Lv. oral argument DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STADENIED
01/08/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/08/1990Case ready to be set
01/08/1990Case ready to be set
12/21/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/21/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/06/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/16/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/16/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/01/1989Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
11/01/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/01/1989Mtn.Lv. oral argument FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
10/05/1989Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
10/05/1989No description available.
09/28/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/20/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
09/14/1989Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
08/24/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
08/17/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/17/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/14/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
08/03/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/26/1989Transcript FILED
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/01/1989Motion for new trial FILED
04/04/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/19/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantKathleen W. Osman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeDale F. Carrington
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantLaura Gibson
Trial Court Information
61st District Court
Harris
Honorable Shearn Smith
87-07692