judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00880-CR
05-89-00880-CR
07/26/1989
Other Drug Sale
Serpa, Felix
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/27/1990Mandate Issued
11/27/1990Mandate Issued
11/07/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/12/1990Order received from trial court
07/26/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
06/27/1990Opinion issued
06/20/1990Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
05/24/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1990Submitted
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
03/12/1990MattConv
01/19/1990Brief Filed
01/19/1990Case ready to be set
01/19/1990Case ready to be set
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/22/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/25/1989Brief Filed
09/26/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/28/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/25/1989Transcript Filed
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/30/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
06/30/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/27/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Verla S Holland
F88-90732-KV
Life TDC