judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: CARMEN M. VOZZELLA

Case Information: 10-BG-1306
Short Caption:IN RE: CARMEN M. VOZZELLAClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN210-10Filed Date:10/25/2010

Opening Event Date:10/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Joseph Charles PerryNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentCarmen M. Vozzella NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/25/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of Florida suspending respondent from the practice of law for one year.
11/08/2010RECEIVED from Bar Counsel a copy of a letter to respondent regarding Bar Counsel's proposed order of interim suspension pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), and advising respondent of his obligation to file the required affidavit.
11/10/2010ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of Florida suspending respondent from the practice of law for one year, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why she should not be suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for one year, with her reinstatement conditioned upon a showing of fitness. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, and stutute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
12/23/2010STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
12/29/2010TMC - statement of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - statement of Bar Counsel - proposed order
01/12/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel the missing page 9 of Attachment B (Respondent's Conditional Guilty Plea for Consent Judgment).
01/13/2011SUSPENSION ORDERED that Carmen M. Vozzella, Esquire is hereby suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for a period of one year with reinstatement conditioned on a showing of fitness. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as she files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (BR,TE,FA)
01/26/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.