judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00695-CV
14-89-00695-CV
07/26/1989
Contract
Prudential Insurance Company of America
Brown, Billy W.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/06/1991Case stored
11/27/1991Motion to withdraw exhibits FILEDGRANTED
11/20/1991Mandate Issued
11/20/1991Mandate Issued
11/14/1991Motion to withdraw exhibits FILED
10/17/1991Motion to stay mandate DISPOSED - ANTDENIED
10/07/1991Opposition filed
10/07/1991Writ of Certiorari DISPOSEDDENIED
10/01/1991Motion to stay mandate FILED - ANT
07/18/1991Motion to stay mandate DISPOSED - ANTGRANTED
06/27/1991Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/25/1991Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/20/1991Motion to stay mandate DISPOSED - ANTGRANTED
06/20/1991Motion to stay mandate FILED - ANT
06/17/1991Writ of certiorari FILED
03/28/1991Motion to stay mandate DISPOSED - ANTGRANTED
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/26/1991Opposition filed
03/26/1991Response to a response FILED-ANT,APE
03/22/1991Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
03/20/1991Motion to stay mandate FILED - ANT
03/12/1991Writ of Error DISPOSEDDENIED
10/25/1990Writ of Error FILED
10/15/1990Writ of Error FILED
10/05/1990No description available.GRANTED
10/05/1990No description available.
09/06/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
08/24/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
08/09/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/09/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/27/1990Submission
06/27/1990Submitted
06/27/1990Submission
06/27/1990Submitted
06/26/1990Misc motion DISPOSEDGRANTED
06/20/1990Misc Motion filed
05/29/1990Submission
03/26/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/26/1990Case ready to be set
03/26/1990Case ready to be set
02/15/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/30/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/15/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/28/1989Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
12/28/1989Supplemental record FILED - ANT,APE,
12/15/1989Exhibits received
12/15/1989Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
12/15/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts RECEIVED-ANT,APE
12/13/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts RECEIVED-ANT,APE
12/12/1989No description available.
12/04/1989No description available.
11/17/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/17/1989Motion to Expedite Appeal DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/17/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
11/16/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
11/16/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
11/13/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/13/1989Motion to Expedite Appeal FILED-ANT,APE,APP
11/08/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
11/02/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
11/01/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
10/16/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/05/1989Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
09/18/1989Affidavit filed
09/15/1989Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
08/10/1989Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
07/28/1989Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
07/26/1989Transcript FILED
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/03/1989Motion for new trial FILED
04/03/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/06/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeJess Mason
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Doris A. Beutel
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeC. Michael Clark
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeMillard A. Johnson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. William J. Dyer
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
Honorable ALICE OLIVER-PARROTT
81-31687