judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00904-CV
05-89-00904-CV
07/26/1989
Other Personal Injury
Decadion Partnership, et al
Marcus & Millichap, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/16/1997Record RetentionDestroy
01/09/1991Mandate Issued
01/09/1991Mandate Issued
11/07/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/29/1990Response to Motion
10/17/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/02/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/1990Opinion Withdrawn
10/02/1990Substitute OpinionAffirmed
10/02/1990Motion for Rehearing Granted
10/02/1990Substitute OpinionAffirmed
07/09/1990Response to Motion
07/03/1990MattConv
07/03/1990Motion for Leave to File
07/03/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/24/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Denied
04/19/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
04/18/1990Submission
04/18/1990Submitted
04/18/1990Submission
04/18/1990Submission
04/18/1990Submitted
04/18/1990Submitted
03/05/1990Letter Filed
03/05/1990Letter Filed
02/23/1990MattConv
11/27/1989Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
11/27/1989Case ready to be set
11/17/1989Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/06/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
11/06/1989Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
10/31/1989Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
10/13/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/01/1989Brief Filed
08/31/1989Letter Sent by the Court
08/02/1989MattConv
07/26/1989Transcript Filed
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/30/1989Appeal Bond Filed
04/05/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
86-9695-A