judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8891
C-8891
07/26/1989
App Writ of Error
A. H. DENIS III ET AL.
KICKAPOO LAND COMPANY ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/07/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
07/26/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/16/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
10/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
08/09/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/09/1989No description available.
08/07/1989Reply to Response
07/26/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/16/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MATTHEWS, JOHN A.RespondentMr. John M. Harmon
RIKE, CARTHERINEPetitionerMr. P. B. Shannon
JOHNSTON, JOAN DENISPetitionerMr. P. B. Shannon
DENIS, RICHARD LEEPetitionerMr. P. B. Shannon
REPUBLICBANK FIRST NATIONALPetitionerMr. P. B. Shannon
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00150-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
771 Sw2d 235, 05-24-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
198th District Court
Concho
2751-A