judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00764-CR
01-89-00764-CR
07/26/1989
Other Felony
Flores, Saul T.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/07/1989Mandate issued
12/07/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
12/07/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
11/06/1989Motion to withdraw appeal
10/30/1989Brief due for retained counsel
09/21/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/21/1989Motion to extend time to file transcript dispGrant motion
09/21/1989Statement of facts filed
09/21/1989Transcript filed
09/05/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/05/1989Motion to extend time to file transcript
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/25/1989Notice of appeal filed
04/28/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/07/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantMark Vela
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
521,956
5 yrs tdc & $5,000 fine