judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-89-00275-CV
08-89-00275-CV
07/26/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Illinois Employers Ins. of Wausau
Renee Belis, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/05/1990Shuck purged
04/05/1990Mandate Issued
04/05/1990Mandate Issued
01/10/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/10/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/09/1989Submitted
11/09/1989Submission
11/09/1989Submitted
10/25/1989Brief Filed
10/25/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/17/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
10/04/1989Submission
09/27/1989Motion for leave to file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
09/25/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/13/1989Motion for leave to * filed
09/07/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
09/05/1989Brief Filed
08/24/1989Fee paid
08/21/1989Miscellaneous filing
08/16/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/16/1989Payment of fee due requested
08/16/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/16/1989Transcript Filed
08/09/1989Motion - Extension time to file bond dispMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/1989Fee paid
07/26/1989Fee paid
07/26/1989Motion - Ext. to File Bond
07/26/1989Payment of fee due requested
07/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. Richard C. Abalos
UnknownAppelleeHon. Ruff Ahders
UnknownAppelleeHon. Elaine Brady
UnknownAppelleeHon. Jerry P. Childs
UnknownAppellantHon. Steve C. Ashley
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Ector
CC2-2974