judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00810-CV
05-89-00810-CV
07/05/1989
Other Personal Injury
Johnson, Lana
Dayton Wayne Price
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/20/1997Record RetentionDestroy
07/19/1990Mandate Issued
07/19/1990Mandate Issued
07/09/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
12/29/1989Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/29/1989MattConv
11/29/1989Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/22/1989Response to Motion
11/14/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/02/1989Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Denied
10/30/1989Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Denied
10/30/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
10/30/1989Motion for Leave to File
10/30/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
10/20/1989Response to Motion
10/16/1989Transcript Filed
10/06/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/06/1989Response to Motion
10/04/1989Extend Time to File Record
09/26/1989Extend Time to File Record
08/25/1989Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/25/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/25/1989Motion to Compel DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/24/1989Response to Motion
08/17/1989Response to Motion
08/15/1989Response to Motion
08/10/1989Extend Time to File Record
08/07/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/07/1989Response to Motion
08/03/1989Response to Motion
07/28/1989Motion to Compel
07/18/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/10/1989Response to Motion
07/05/1989Affidavit Filed
07/05/1989Mtn. to Extend Time to File Affidavit
07/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/28/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Frank Andrews
86-12432-F