judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00808-CV
05-89-00808-CV
07/05/1989
Bond Forfeiture
City Bail Bonds
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order enteredDestroy
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/20/1997Record RetentionDestroy
10/23/1989Mandate Issued
10/23/1989Mandate Issued
08/25/1989Order EnteredDismissed
08/25/1989Order EnteredDismissed
08/14/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
08/10/1989Letter Sent by the Court
07/13/1989Letter Sent by the Court
07/05/1989Transcript Filed
07/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/03/1989Appeal Bond Filed
01/09/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable Frances Maloney
F88-77503-K