judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00788-CV
05-89-00788-CV
07/05/1989
Mandamus
Commonwealth Mortgage Corporation
Hon. Joseph B. Morris, Judge, 101st Judicial District Court
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/29/1997Record RetentionDestroy
08/17/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/19/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/19/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/18/1989Motion for Leave to File
07/12/1989Affidavit Filed
07/12/1989Response to Motion
07/10/1989Order Entered
07/06/1989Affidavit Filed
07/05/1989Motion for Leave to File
07/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
101st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joseph B. Morris
86-9529-E