judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID CHARLES WALSH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0151)
Case Number:S-08-0151Case Docketed On:07/18/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DAVID CHARLES WALSH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID CHARLES WALSH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid Charles WalshDiane M. Lozano
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/18/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/02/2008Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
09/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to supplement record; and proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/03/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/04/2008Order - Grant - extension of time to file appellant's briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/10/2008Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion for motion hearingRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
09/24/2008Order - Denying, without prejudice, motion to supplement recordOrderDenyFinal
10/06/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/14/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion to dismiss and waiver of appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/15/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal